Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/04/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Benjamin B. Childs - check no. 10198. | | |
05/04/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. -SEALED- Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).)clerk5 | | 07-09958 |
05/10/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 on cross-appeal from Alverson Taylor Mortensen & Sanders--check no. 72899. | | |
05/10/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. -SEALED- (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) | | 07-10433 |
05/16/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Phillip Aurbach. | | 07-10826 |
05/17/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. and Automatic Stay of Litigation. | | 07-10983 |
05/17/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. for Notice of Filing Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Litigation | | 07-10985 |
05/21/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Due to the Notice of Filing of Bankruptcy Stay, Appellant/Cross-Respondent will not be taking any action on this case. | | 07-11134 |
05/25/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Notice of 5/17/07 served on settlement judge. | | 07-11642 |
06/13/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. because a bankruptcy stay has been ordered. | | 07-12924 |
07/11/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Entry of Order Lifting Bankruptcy Stay. | | 07-15082 |
07/16/2007 | Docketing Statement | Received Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. FILED PER ORDER OF 11/29/07. | | 07-15361 |
07/23/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. | | 07-16051 |
07/31/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant Jay Selznick, D.M.D., M.D.'s) | | 07-16831 |
11/01/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Settlement Judge is recusing himself from this matter and request reassignment to another settlement judge. | | 07-23986 |
11/29/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This appeal and cross-appeal may proceed. The clerk of this court shall file both of the docketing statements that were provisionally received on July 16, 2007 and July 26, 2007, respectively. | | 07-25802 |
11/29/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. | | 07-15361 |
11/29/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. | | 07-16432 |
11/29/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Leonard Gang. | | 07-25850 |
01/22/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | | 08-01617 |
03/07/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 08-05802 |
03/26/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion to Unseal the Court Record and Dismiss Appeal and Motion to Supplement the Record if the Motion to Dismiss Appeal is Denied of if Selznick Continues with his Appeal. | | 08-07461 |
04/07/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion to Unseal the Court Record and Dismiss Appeal and Motion to Supplement the Record if the Motion to Dismiss Appeal is Denied of if Selznick Continues with his Appeal. | | 08-08632 |
06/03/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion in Part, Granting Motion in Part and Reinstating Briefing. We deny the motion as to the requests to unseal the record and to dimiss the appeal. We grant the alternative relief requested in th emotion. Appellant may supplement her appendix with the materials that the district court reviewed in camera. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant's and Respondent's transcript request forms due: 15 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. | | 08-13985 |
06/18/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/06/06. To Court Reporter: Laura Corcoran. (Appellant/Cross-Respondent Hopkins). | | 08-15643 |
07/01/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Transcript Request. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. Due Date: 10 days | | 08-16699 |
07/08/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 08-17329 |
07/11/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/06/06. To Court Reporter: Lara Corcoran. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant Selznick). | | 08-17830 |
07/11/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Granting Motion. Court Recorder Lara Corcoran's certificate of delivery due: July 30, 2008. | | 08-17855 |
08/06/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: October 1, 2008. | | 08-20361 |
08/11/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Lara Corcoran stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/06/06. | | 08-20639 |
09/19/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. | | 08-24366 |
09/19/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | | 08-24367 |
10/16/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Respondent/Cross-Appellant Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal (First Request). Document due date: November 19, 2008. | | 08-26698 |
10/17/2008 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Courtesy copy of letter addressed to Benjamin B. Childs from Jeffrey D. Olster stating that the Lewis firm does not represent Dr. Selznick in this matter. | | 08-26836 |
10/20/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Extend Deadline to File Answering Brief. | | 08-26997 |
10/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant's motion for reconsideration is denied. | | 08-27214 |
11/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Hopkins' Appeal, or in the Alternative, to Strike Portions of Hopkins' Opening Brief. | | 08-29822 |
11/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal (Second Request). | | 08-29831 |
12/03/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opposition to Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion to Dismiss Hopkins' Appeal, or in the Alternative, to Strike Portions of Hopkins' Opening Brief. | | 08-30779 |
12/03/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion to Strike Respondent's Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Appeal and for Imposition of Sanctions Pursuant to NRAP 28(e). | | 08-30782 |
12/17/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Strike Respondent's Answering Brief and for Imposition of Sanctions. | | 08-31957 |
01/22/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. respondent's motion to dismiss this appeal is denied. Respondent's motion to strike this portion "regarding the sealing of [the underlying] case" of the opening brief is denied. We deny respondent's motion to strike the portion of appellant's opening brief entitled ""Law Relating to Contract Interpretation and Argument on This Issue," and portions referring to NRS 630.3065 and 45 CFR 164.508. Respondent's motion for sanctions is denied. The clerk shall file the combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal, and the appendix received on November 21, 2008. Appellant's motion to strike respondent's combined brief is denied. The clerk shall file each of respondent's notices of errata received on December 3, 2008, respondent's notice of errata received on December 18, 2008, and appellant's reply brief received on December 24, 2008. Appellant's motion for sanctions for failure to comply with NRAP 28(e) is denied. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal, if deemed necessary. NRAP 28(c) and 31(a)(1). | | 09-01836 |
01/22/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | | 08-29833 |
01/22/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. | | 08-29835 |
01/22/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Errata to Respondent's Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. | | 08-30773 |
01/22/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Errata to Appendix of Answering Brief. | | 08-30776 |
01/22/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Second Notice of Errata to Respondent's Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant). | | 08-32085 |
01/22/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 08-32670 |
01/28/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike. Respondent's Motion to Strike Portions of Hopkins' Reply Brief. | | 09-02463 |
01/28/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. | | 09-02471 |
02/02/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opposition to Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Motion to Strike Portions of Hopkins' Reply Brief. | | 09-02905 |
02/03/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Withdawal of Section II of Respondent's Motion to Strike Portions of Hopkins' Reply Brief. | | 09-02928 |
02/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion to Strike. We conclude that neither the striking of the appellant's brief nor the imposition of sanctions are warranted. fn1[Respondent has filed a motion seeking to withdraw the portion of his motion requesting sanctions. In light of this order, we deny that request as moot.] | | 09-03364 |
03/05/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted for decision on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. | | 09-05652 |
03/05/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
09/28/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "We AFFIRM the order of the district court." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | | 09-23577 |
10/23/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 09-25936 |
10/23/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
11/04/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 27, 2009. | | 09-25936 |