judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5823
A-5823
05/03/1956
Application for Writ of Error
J. S. LIVINGSTON
MCMULLEN OIL AND ROYALTY COMPANY, INC., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/14/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/11/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
05/03/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/14/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/23/1956Document received (See Remarks)
05/21/1956Amendment to Motion filed
05/21/1956Response to Motion filed
05/14/1956Response to Motion filed
05/11/1956Motion to dismiss
05/11/1956Response to Petition
05/08/1956Miscellaneous Motion
05/03/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
McMullen Oil and Royalty Company, Inc., et al.Respondent
J. S. LivingstonPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information