judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5808
A-5808
04/26/1956
Application for Writ of Error
CLYDE L. HISKETT AND BILLY J. MORRISON
JACK K. WELLS, JR., INDIVIDUALLY, AS TRUSTEE AND AS ADMINISTRATOR AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF J. K. WELLS, DECEASED
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/20/1956Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
07/11/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/16/1956Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/26/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
04/26/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/24/1956Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
07/20/1956Brief in Support of Petition
07/11/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/16/1956Reply to Response
05/26/1956Response to Petition
04/28/1956Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
04/26/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/26/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jack K. Wells, Jr., individually, as Trustee and as Administrator and Executor of the Estate of J. K. Wells, deceasedRespondent
Clyde L. Hiskett and Billy J. MorrisonPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information