judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5817
A-5817
05/01/1956
Application for Writ of Error
W. L. EASON
O. B. ROBERTSON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/14/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/10/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
05/01/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/25/1956Motion to Consolidate filedFiling granted
06/19/1956Response to Motion filed
06/14/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/10/1956Response to Petition
05/01/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/01/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. L. EasonPetitioner
O. B. Robertson, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information