Case: 10-23-00148-CR
10-23-00148-CR
05/18/2023
Habeas Corpus
Ex Parte Aniruddha Chitale
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/28/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State |
| ||
08/03/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/28/2023 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
08/28/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
08/17/2023 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
08/03/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
08/01/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
07/25/2023 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
07/03/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
06/30/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
06/21/2023 | Response requested by the court | Dissent to Order |
| ||||
06/21/2023 | Response requested by the court |
| |||||
06/12/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
06/02/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
05/18/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
04/18/2023 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/28/2023 | At Issue | At issue |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Andrea L. Westerfeld M. Ann Montgomery |
Chitale, Aniruddha Ashok | Criminal - Appellant | Scott C. Smith |
Trial Court Information
40th District Court
Ellis
Honorable Cynthia Ermatinger
29142CR-A
Michele McManus