Case: 23-1008
23-1008
12/12/2023
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
PAUL JOHNSON
BASTROP CENTRAL APPRAISAL DISTRICT
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/16/2024 | Amended Petition | Petitioner | Amended Petition for Review filed on behalf of Paul Johnson. | |||||
12/28/2023 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | Appendix to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Paul Johnson. | |||||
12/11/2023 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Paul Johnson. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/16/2024 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
01/19/2024 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of Bastrop Central Appraisal District. | ||||||
01/16/2024 | Amended Petition | Amended Petition for Review filed on behalf of Paul Johnson. | ||||||
01/16/2024 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
01/05/2024 | Motion to Amend disposed | Filing granted | Motion to Amend Petition for Review granted |
| ||||
12/29/2023 | Electronic communication sent to Party | E-mail sent to Respondent regarding stance on the Motion. | | |||||
12/28/2023 | Motion to Amend Filed | Motion to Amend Petition for Review filed on behalf of Paul Johnson. | ||||||
12/28/2023 | Appendix Filed | Appendix to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Paul Johnson. | ||||||
12/12/2023 | Clerk's Record | | | |||||
12/11/2023 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Paul Johnson. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/04/2024 | Status | Motion for rehearing due to be filed. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Johnson, Paul | Petitioner | Ms. Lisa Adams Mr. Paul Johnson |
Bastrop Central Appraisal District | Respondent | Mr. Matthew Tepper Sharon Coffee Baxter |
Court of Appeals Information:
07-23-00173-CV
Affirmed
___ SW3d ___, 09-29-23
7th Court of Appeals
Honorable Judy Crowder Parker
Trial Court Information
335th District Court
Bastrop
Honorable Reva L. Towslee Corbett
2274-335