judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5818
A-5818
05/01/1956
Application for Writ of Error
TURNER ROOFING AND SUPPLY COMPANY, RUFUS A. WALKER AND COMPANY
UNITED PACIFIC INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/10/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/18/1956Supplement to ResponseRespondent
05/17/1956Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/12/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
05/12/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
05/01/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
05/01/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/13/1956Response to Motion filed
07/10/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/18/1956Supplement to Response
05/17/1956Reply to Response
05/12/1956Response to Petition
05/12/1956Response to Petition
05/01/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/01/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/01/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Turner Roofing and Supply CompanyPetitioner
United Pacific Insurance CompanyRespondent
Rufus A. Walker and CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information