Case: 23-0944
23-0944
11/20/2023
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE TRENT BROOKSHIRE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/20/2024 | Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus | Relator | Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Trent Brookshire. | |||||
02/12/2024 | Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed | Real Parties in Interest | Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Caroline Brookshire. | |||||
11/20/2023 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Relator | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Trent Brookshire. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/2024 | Brief on the Merits Requested | Brief on the merits requested: Relator's brief due no later than April 8, 2024; Response brief due April 29, 2024; Reply brief due May 14, 2024. |
| |||||
02/20/2024 | Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus | Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Trent Brookshire. | ||||||
02/12/2024 | Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed | Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Caroline Brookshire. | ||||||
01/17/2024 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus is granted. Response is due February 12, 2024. Further requests for extensions of time for this filing will be disfavored. |
| ||||
01/17/2024 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Caroline Brookshire. | ||||||
12/22/2023 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to petition for writ of mandamus due no later than January 22, 2024. |
| |||||
11/21/2023 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
11/20/2023 | Case Record Filed | Mandamus Record filed on behalf of Trent Brookshire. | ||||||
11/20/2023 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Trent Brookshire. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
04/08/2024 | Status | Relator brief on the merits due | |
04/29/2024 | Status | Respondent/Real party in interest brief on the merit due | |
05/14/2024 | Status | Pet/Rel reply brief on the merits due | |
11/21/2023 | Work-Up by Staff / Review by Justices | Under Review |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Brookshire, Trent | Relator | Mr. R. Rogge Dunn Mr. Charles (Chad) E. Baruch Mr. Coyt (Randy) R. Johnston |
Brookshire, Caroline | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Gregory D. Smith Mr. Allen Franklin Gardner Mr. Nolan Duane Smith |
Brookshire Grocery Company and Brookshire Holdings, Inc. | Other interested party | Mr. Jack Walker Jamie Drillette Ms. Melissa M. Goodman Mr. Michael K. Hurst Ms. Sara Chelette |
Court of Appeals Information:
12-23-00236-CV
Denied
___ SW3d ___, 11-08-23
12th Court of Appeals
Honorable Gregory W. Neeley
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 3
Smith
Honorable Clay White
74544-B