judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JUDY CRAWFORD V. JERRY WEINSTEIN, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1140
Short Caption:JUDY CRAWFORD V. JERRY WEINSTEIN, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB6475-10Filed Date:09/02/2010

Opening Event Date:09/02/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/01/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJudy Crawford YPro SeN
AppelleeJerry Weinstein N
Brian D. RigerNN
AppelleeGaben Management LLCN
Brian D. RigerNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/02/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/23/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-FINAL and NON-APPEALABLE order. See Urciolo v. Washington, 305 A.2d 252 (DC 1973). (BY: ETW)
09/23/2010TMC - OTSC
11/09/2010 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED since the denial of a temporary restraining order is not appealable. See Network Tech, Servs, Inc. v. DC Data 464 A.2d 133 (DC 1983)... (OBNBST) (rm)
11/09/2010DISMISSED
12/01/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived