Case Information: 36289 | |||
Short Caption: | PATTERSON (TERRELL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C155153 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/15/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/15/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-10231 | |
07/11/2000 | Order/Counsel | Filed Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Robert Thompson shall file the transcript request form within 10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days of this order. This appeal shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 3C. | 00-11781 | |
07/25/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 7/13/99 and 5/18/00. Court Reporters: Debra Van Blaricom c/o Shirlee Prawalsky and Shirlee Prawalsky. Filed in district court on: July 21, 2000. | 00-12855 | |
07/25/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 4/28/99 and 5/3/00. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. Filed in district court on: July 21, 2000. | 00-12856 | |
07/31/2000 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 4/28/99 and 5/3/00. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. | 00-13200 | |
08/22/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 00-14708 | |
08/22/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 00-14710 | |
08/31/2000 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 00-15393 | |
10/02/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. We conclude that the district court did not abuse its discretion and appellant's contention is without merit. " . . . the order of the district court is affirmed. SNP00A-CY/WM/NB | 00-17289 | |
10/31/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-17366 | |
10/31/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/04/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2000. | 00-17366 |