judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMIE STANTON, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0265)
Case Number:S-07-0265Case Docketed On:11/19/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Certiorari
Short Title:JAMIE STANTON, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JAMIE STANTON, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerJamie Stanton Pro Se
RespondentThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/19/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/19/2007Petition - Writ - certiorariPetitionWrit - certiorariFinal
11/19/2007Event - Phone Call. Called Mike Causey at AG's and told him Mr. Stanton filed a petition for writ of certiorari, no certificate of service was included.EventPhone CallFinal
11/20/2007Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice Burke recused.Notice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
11/28/2007Response/Objection - Petition for reviewResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
12/12/2007Order - Petition for review - denyOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
12/13/2007Correspondence - Incoming from appellant, response to appellee's response, returned unfiledCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
12/13/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal