Case Information: 93-CV-0308 | |||
Short Caption: | DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA V. LATISHA REID | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant |
Lead: | 92-CV-1479 | Consolidated: | 93-CV-0308, 93-CV-0375 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | LT13715-92 | Filed Date: | 03/17/1993 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 03/17/1993 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 05/19/1993 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 07/12/1995 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 11/14/1995 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 06/24/1996 |
Party Information | |||||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||||||||
Appellant | District of Columbia | N |
| ||||||||||||
Appellee | Latisha Reid | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
03/17/1993 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
03/18/1993 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until the decision in case presenting identical issues. | |||
03/18/1993 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE w/92 CV 1479 | |||
03/18/1993 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE w/93cv308 | |||
03/23/1993 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT | |||
04/29/1993 | ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT MOTION FOR STAY pending the disposition of 91-CV-1251. (By RO) | |||
05/18/1993 | ORDER GRANTING - The motion of appellant in appeal no. 92-CV-1479 to stay the briefing schedule is granted and the briefing schedule is hereby stayed pending decision in appeal no. 91-CV-1251. (By RO) | |||
05/18/1993 | CASE STAYED | |||
05/19/1993 | RECORD ON APPEAL in 93-CV-375 | |||
05/19/1993 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
03/15/1995 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL | |||
03/16/1995 | TMC - Aplt's motion for summary reversal 3/15 | |||
03/24/1995 | APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to summary reversal | |||
03/24/1995 | APPEARANCE of Laura A. Eilers on behalf of aple (retained) | |||
03/24/1995 | APPELLANT'S REPLY to opposition to motion for summary reversal. | |||
06/02/1995 | ORDER DENY APPELLANT MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL. F/O that the stay of these appeals entered by this court on May 19, 1993, is hereby vacated, and the brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. (By: ST, SC, KN) | |||
06/02/1995 | PROCEED WITH APPEAL, NO LONGER ON HOLD/STAYED | |||
06/07/1995 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |||
06/09/1995 | APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to correct brief | |||
06/09/1995 | RECEIVED - corrected BA | |||
06/27/1995 | ORDER GRANT APLT MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to file a corrected brief, and the lodged corrected brief of appellant is filed. F/O that the brief of appellee shall remain due to be filed on or before July 12, 1995. (By: WHN) | |||
06/27/1995 | APPELLANT'S AMENDED/CORRECTED BRIEF | |||
07/12/1995 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
07/12/1995 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
07/27/1995 | APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF- to9/2/95 | |||
07/31/1995 | FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR | |||
08/02/1995 | LETTER TO COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING | |||
08/04/1995 | ORDERED that the motion is granted, and the brief of appellant shall be filed on or before September 2, 1995. Any further request for an extension of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (BY: WHN) | |||
08/04/1995 | LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING (appellant). | |||
09/05/1995 | APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF | |||
11/14/1995 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
11/14/1995 | ARGUED (FE,RD,PR) James C. McKay, Jr., Esquire, for appellant. Carol J. Bettencourt, Esquire, for appellee. | |||
12/18/1995 | REVERSED Opinion | |||
01/02/1996 | APLE MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EB to 30 days (NO OPPO) | |||
01/19/1996 | ORD GRT APLE MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE PET FOR REH EB on or before February 1, 1996. (WA) | |||
02/01/1996 | CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED - Carol J. Bettencourt 702 H. Street, N.W. Suite 400 Washington, DC 20001 202 638-4798 | |||
02/01/1996 | APPELLEE'S PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC | |||
02/22/1996 | ORDER directing appellant within 20 days from the date of this order to file a response to pet for rehearing en banc (10 copies). (WA) | |||
02/27/1996 | APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE - to D.C.'s petition for rehearing en banc | |||
06/13/1996 | ORDER DENYING APLE PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC (EB) (Judge Ruiz is recused from this case.) | |||
06/24/1996 | MANDATE ISSUED |