Case: 05-23-01261-CV
05-23-01261-CV
12/12/2023
Contract
PrimaLend Capital Partners, LP and LNCMJ Management, LLC
Meir Benit, Individually, and Ron Benit, as Trustee of the Meir Benit Trust
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/21/2024 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
02/15/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
02/14/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
01/22/2024 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
01/13/2024 | Record due | | |||||
12/22/2023 | Docketing statement filed | ||||||
12/19/2023 | Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
12/15/2023 | Letter filed | | |||||
12/14/2023 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
12/14/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
12/12/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
12/12/2023 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
12/12/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
12/12/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||
12/12/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
11/30/2023 | Findings of fact and conclusions of law filed | | |||||
09/15/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/22/2024 | Status | Appellant brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
PrimaLend Capital Partners, LP , et al. | Appellant | Marcy Hogan Greer Kimberly H. Kerns Laurie N. Patton R. Scott Seifert Jacob Sparks |
Meir Benit, et al. | Appellee | Brent M. Rubin Brian P. Shaw Jr. |
Trial Court Information
95th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Monica Purdy
DC-21-06229
Deana K. Rouse