Case: 05-23-01178-CV
05-23-01178-CV
11/21/2023
Contract
Ben Randolph, Agency Entourage, LLC and Patriot Leasing Company, LLC
7700 John Carpenter, LLC
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/01/2024 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
02/29/2024 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||
01/26/2024 | No reporters record filed in civil case |
| |||||
01/22/2024 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
01/18/2024 | Record due | | |||||
12/01/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||
12/01/2023 | Docketing statement filed | ||||||
11/21/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
11/21/2023 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
11/21/2023 | Fee requested |
| |||||
11/21/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
11/20/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
10/20/2023 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
09/20/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/11/2024 | Status | Court reporters record due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
7700 John Carpenter, LLC | Appellee | David M. Watson William S. Richmond |
Ben Randolph, et al. | Appellant | T. Chase Garrett Walker Steven Young |
Trial Court Information
68th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Martin Hoffman
DC-20-09666
Antionette Reagor