Case: 14-21-00749-CV
14-21-00749-CV
12/20/2021
Personal Injury
Jake's Inc. d/b/a Jake's Finer Foods
LaMarcus Hearn
No
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/29/2022 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
03/02/2022 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/07/2022 | Case stored | | |||||||
06/07/2022 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
06/07/2022 | Motion to dismiss disposed | GRANTED | | ||||||
06/07/2022 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||||
06/07/2022 | Memorandum opinion issued | DISMISSED |
| ||||||
06/07/2022 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||||
06/06/2022 | Submitted | | |||||||
05/24/2022 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||||
04/29/2022 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
04/29/2022 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
04/29/2022 | Appellees brief due | | |||||||
04/28/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||||
04/22/2022 | Appellees brief due | | |||||||
04/20/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
03/22/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||||
03/22/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
03/22/2022 | Appellees brief due | | |||||||
03/02/2022 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
03/02/2022 | Appellants brief due | | |||||||
03/01/2022 | Appellants brief due | | |||||||
01/31/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||||||
01/31/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
01/18/2022 | Reporters record due | | |||||||
01/13/2022 | Response due | | |||||||
01/12/2022 | Response due | | |||||||
01/11/2022 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
01/05/2022 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
01/05/2022 | Document returned |
| |||||||
01/04/2022 | Fee paid |
| |||||||
01/04/2022 | Docketing statement due | | |||||||
01/03/2022 | Notice of late record |
| |||||||
01/03/2022 | Past due court fee notice |
| |||||||
12/30/2021 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
12/30/2021 | Court fee due | | |||||||
12/28/2021 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||||
12/27/2021 | Reporters record due | | |||||||
12/27/2021 | Record due | | |||||||
12/20/2021 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
12/20/2021 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
12/20/2021 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||||
12/17/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
11/29/2021 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/07/2022 | Case Stored | Case stored |
06/07/2028 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Jake's Inc. d/b/a Jake's Finer Foods | Appellant | Carl Evans Jr. Samantha Chaiken |
Hearn, LaMarcus | Appellee | Scott P. Armstrong Joshua Lee Teri Russell |
Trial Court Information
157th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 157th District Court
2021-48292
Court Reporter, 157th District Court