judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5837
A-5837
05/07/1956
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT L. WRIGHT
VERNON COMPRESS COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/12/1956Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/04/1956Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
06/15/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
05/07/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/12/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/28/1956Opinion issued
10/04/1956Brief on the Merits
07/11/1956Document received (See Remarks)
07/11/1956Document received (See Remarks)
06/15/1956Response to Petition
05/14/1956Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
05/07/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/07/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Robert L. WrightPetitioner
Vernon Compress CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information