Case: 05-23-00910-CR
05-23-00910-CR
09/15/2023
Sex Offenses
Robert Patrick Dobbs
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/20/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/20/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
02/20/2024 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
01/23/2024 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
01/20/2024 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
01/19/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
12/30/2023 | Record due | | |||||
12/21/2023 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
11/01/2023 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
09/18/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
09/15/2023 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
09/15/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
09/15/2023 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
09/15/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
09/14/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
09/01/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/21/2024 | Status | State brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Dobbs, Robert Patrick | Criminal - Appellant | John L. Schomburger |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Greg A. Willis |
Trial Court Information
219th Judicial District Court
Collin
Honorable Jennifer Edgeworth
219-84344-2022
Tonya Lebo
25 yrs., TDCJ