judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE OF WYOMING BY AND THROUGH THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE v. HANOVER COMPRESSION, LP

Case Heading (S-07-0264)
Case Number:S-07-0264Case Docketed On:11/16/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Rule 12.09(b) Certification - Civil - Taxation and Revenue (Title 39)
Short Title:STATE OF WYOMING BY AND THROUGH THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE v. HANOVER COMPRESSION, LP
Full Title:STATE OF WYOMING BY AND THROUGH THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, Appellant (Petitioner), v. HANOVER COMPRESSION, LP Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDepartment of RevenueBruce A. Salzburg
Michael L. Hubbard
Martin L. Hardsocg
William Francis Russell
AppelleeHanover Compression, LPNicole Crighton
Jesse R. Adams, III

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Taxation
Opinion Number:2008 WY 138
Citation:196 P.3d 781

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/16/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/16/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/16/2007Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order of certification Rule 12.09(b)Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder of certification Rule 12.09(b)Final
12/04/2007Order - Rule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptOrderRule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptFinal
01/17/2008Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on cd and designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
03/05/2008Brief - Appellee, received copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
03/05/2008Event - Phone Call from assistant for appellee re page numbers. Discovered error in format of page numbers. Suggested filing errataEventPhone CallFinal
03/11/2008Motion - Correct a Document - brief of appellee (received original copy of proposed brief)MotionCorrect a DocumentFinal
03/11/2008Event - Phone Call to office of counsel for appellee and instructed them to provide six copies of the brief. Also, advised that Mr. Adams is not admitted pro hac vice and if he is participating, that process needs to be completedEventPhone CallFinal
03/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Other copies of corrected brief receivedNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/14/2008Order - Granting unopposed motion to file corrected brief. Original and copies of brief file stampedOrderGrantFinal
03/18/2008Motion - Admission pro hac vice for Jesse R. Adams, III to appear on behalf of appellee.MotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
03/18/2008Order - Pro hac vice - allowOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
03/20/2008Brief - Appellant reply and copy of brief on cdBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Attachment inadvertently omitted on Appellee's BriefNotice-IncomingAttachmentFinal
03/28/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, agency record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/28/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/02/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - William Russell for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jesse R. Adams, III for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/13/2008Event - Oral argument presented - ARgued before full court (William Russell, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellant; Jesse R. Adams, III and Nicole Crighton, argument by Mr. Adams for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/13/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Change of address for Jesse R. Adams, III (faxed copy)Notice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
10/14/2008Notice-Incoming - Change of address for Jesse R. Adams, III (original)Notice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
11/21/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/09/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/09/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/09/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/09/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/15/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 12/12/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal