judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PULLUM (VIRGINIA) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36288
Short Caption:PULLUM (VIRGINIA) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C127819Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/09/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/15/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/15/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Sat in district court proceedings.
06/15/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-10226
06/15/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: March 6, 2000, March 7, 2000, March 8, 2000 and May 4, 2000. Court Reporters: Patsy Smith and Renee Silvaggio. Filed in district court on: June 9, 2000. 00-10227
06/23/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. within which to File Rough Draft Transcripts. 00-10759
07/07/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 4, 2000. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 00-11619
07/12/2000TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 03/06/00; 03/07/00; and 03/08/00. Court Reporter: Patsy Smith. 00-12012
07/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 23, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file the rough draft transcripts and fast track statement. On July 7, 2000 and July 12, 2000, the transcripts were filed. The motion for an extension of time to file the transcripts is denied, as moot. The motion for an extension of time to file the fast track statement is granted. The fast track statement shall be filed on or before August 4, 2000. 00-12404
08/07/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-13671
08/07/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-13672
08/21/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-14659
08/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days. fn2[We suspend the requirement in NRAP9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 00-15001
10/10/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: October 13, 2000. 00-17843
02/08/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-02641
03/22/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received on February 8, 2001. We admonish appellant's counsel for her dereliction in communicating with this court. The clerk shall file the answering brief received March 8, 2001. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a reply brief, if any. Failure to file a timely reply brief may be treated as an election not to file a reply brief. 01-05057
03/22/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 2/6/01. 01-02643
03/22/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-04283
04/25/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 04/23/01. 01-06966
09/21/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Gloria Navarro has joined the office of the Special Public Defender and will remain appellate counsel in this matter. 01-16017
11/09/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-18714
11/09/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML
12/05/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that the prosecutor in this case did not overstep the bounds of permissible argument when he commented on her presence in the courtroom during the earlier testimony of other witnesses. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-20304
01/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20401
01/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on Janaury 7, 2002. 01-20401