Case: 05-23-01311-CR
05-23-01311-CR
12/28/2023
Sex Offenses
Stacey Jurik
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/07/2024 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
03/06/2024 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
03/06/2024 | Reporters record due | | |||||
02/06/2024 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
02/05/2024 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
02/05/2024 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
02/05/2024 | Record due | | |||||
01/12/2024 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
01/10/2024 | Notice received | | |||||
01/09/2024 | Notice filed | | |||||
01/08/2024 | Notice filed | | |||||
12/28/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
12/28/2023 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
12/28/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
12/22/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
12/07/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/09/2024 | Status | Reporter record due per court order |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Greg A. Willis Lisa Smith Braxton |
Jurik, Stacey | Criminal - Appellant | John B. Setterberg Christopher D. Mulder |
Trial Court Information
366th Judicial District Court
Collin
Honorable Tomasz Nowak
366-80718-2023
Antoinette Varela
32 yrs., TDCJ