Case: 13-23-00564-CV
13-23-00564-CV
12/11/2023
Malpractice
Clifford Luttrell, DDS and Boerne Dental Center, PLLC
Amy Mulroy
No
4th Court of Appeals
12/11/2023
04-23-01034-CV
13th Court of Appeals - Corpus Christi
12/11/2023
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/05/2024 | Appearance of counsel | | |||
01/04/2024 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
01/04/2024 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||
01/04/2024 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||
01/03/2024 | Notice of late docketing statement |
| |||
01/02/2024 | Corrected document requested | | |||
01/02/2024 | Reporters record filed |
| |||
01/02/2024 | Reporters record filed | | |||
01/02/2024 | Reporters record filed | | |||
12/18/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||
12/13/2023 | Document filed | | |||
12/12/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
12/11/2023 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals |
| |||
12/11/2023 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Grant motion | | ||
12/08/2023 | Appearance of counsel | | |||
12/08/2023 | Fee paid | | |||
11/29/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||
11/29/2023 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||
11/28/2023 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||
11/28/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||
10/30/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/27/2024 | Status | Court reporters record due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Boerne Dental Center, PLLC | Appellant | Hon. James W. Veale Jr. Hon. Maya Henry Hon. Thomas F. Nye |
Mulroy, Amy | Appellee | Hon. Anna Fredrickson Hon. Lance H. Lubel Hon. McKenna Harper Hon. Cassidy Daniels Hon. Sharon S. Mccally Hon. Byron C. Keeling |
Clifford Luttrell, DDS | Appellant | Hon. Thomas F. Nye Hon. James W. Veale Jr. Hon. Maya Henry |
Trial Court Information
45th District Court
Bexar
Honorable David A. Canales
2021-CI-20026
Luis Duran