judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5835
A-5835
05/04/1956
Application for Writ of Error
W. R. HARRIS, ET AL., F. E. GRANDSTAFF, NEXT FRIEND FOR MINOR, JERRY GRANDSTAFF
KERMIT COCHRAN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/10/1956Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/06/1956Response to Brief filedRespondent
07/05/1956Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
06/08/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/23/1956Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/11/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
05/11/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
05/04/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
05/04/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/10/1956Reply to Response
07/06/1956Response to Brief filed
07/05/1956Brief in Support of Petition
06/25/1956Response to Motion filed
06/08/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/23/1956Reply to Response
05/11/1956Response to Petition
05/11/1956Response to Petition
05/04/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/04/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/04/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. R. Harris, et al.Petitioner
F. E. Grandstaff, Next Friend for minor, Jerry GrandstaffPetitioner
Kermit Cochran, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information