Case: 01-23-00245-CV
01-23-00245-CV
04/04/2023
Administrative Law - Summary Judgment
Johnnie Melton and Shelley Melton
Big Creek Construction, Ltd. and WFMM, LLC
No
10th Court of Appeals
04/04/2023
10-23-00080-CV
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/08/2024 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||
11/17/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
08/18/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/08/2024 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||
01/08/2024 | Reply brief due | | |||||
12/14/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||
12/07/2023 | Reply brief due | | |||||
12/01/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
12/01/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed |
| |||||
11/17/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
11/17/2023 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
11/17/2023 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
11/03/2023 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
10/18/2023 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
10/11/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
10/11/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
09/18/2023 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
09/12/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
09/11/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
08/18/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
08/18/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
08/17/2023 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
08/04/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
08/03/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion to extend time; absent extraordinary circumstances, Court will not grant additional motions to extend time |
| ||||
08/03/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
08/03/2023 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
08/02/2023 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
07/05/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
06/21/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
06/21/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
06/05/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
05/24/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
05/24/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
05/12/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||
05/08/2023 | Response due | | |||||
05/08/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||
05/05/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
05/04/2023 | Document Received | Refused | | ||||
05/04/2023 | Document Received | Refused | | ||||
05/01/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
04/27/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
04/07/2023 | Order entered | Issue sua sponte order |
| ||||
04/07/2023 | No clerks record filed in civil case |
| |||||
04/06/2023 | Document filed |
| |||||
04/04/2023 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals |
| |||||
04/04/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
04/04/2023 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
03/17/2023 | Record due | | |||||
03/14/2023 | Fee paid | | |||||
03/13/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||
12/16/2022 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
11/17/2022 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/17/2023 | At Issue | At issue |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Melton, Johnnie | Appellant | Thomas Matthew Michel Lauren M. Lockett |
WFMM, LLC | Appellee | Eric B. Boettcher Jessica Z. Barger Jeffrey J. Wolf |
Melton, Shelley | Appellant | Lauren M. Lockett Thomas Matthew Michel |
Big Creek Construction, Ltd. | Appellee | Eric B. Boettcher Jessica Z. Barger Jeffrey J. Wolf Landon Francois |
Trial Court Information
82nd District Court
Falls
Honorable Bryan Franklin Russ
CV40970
Patricia (Trish) Schulz