Case: 11-21-00241-CV
11-21-00241-CV
10/21/2021
Real Property
Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc.
Centralia Permian, LLC
No
www.11thcoa.courts.state.tx.us
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/18/2022 | Case stored | | |||||||
07/18/2022 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
07/01/2022 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
06/30/2022 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||
06/30/2022 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
06/29/2022 | Submitted | | |||||||
06/22/2022 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||||
06/22/2022 | Case reinstated | | |||||||
04/21/2022 | Order issued | Abated |
| ||||||
04/21/2022 | Motion to abate appeal disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
04/13/2022 | Motion to abate appeal filed |
| |||||||
03/24/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
03/16/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
03/03/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
02/23/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
01/27/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
01/24/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
12/29/2021 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
11/29/2021 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
11/29/2021 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||||
11/22/2021 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
10/29/2021 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
10/29/2021 | Fee paid | | |||||||
10/21/2021 | Case Information Sheet from trial court clerk filed |
| |||||||
10/21/2021 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||||
10/20/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
10/12/2021 | Document filed | | |||||||
08/30/2021 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||||
07/30/2021 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/18/2022 | Case Stored | Case stored |
07/18/2028 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc. | Appellant | Jacob M. Davidson Andrew McCollam III Ryan Clinton John A. "Jad" Davis |
Centralia Permian, LLC. | Appellee | Nicholas S. Davis Conrad D. Hester Scott A. Brister Alix Allison Robert C. Vartabedian |
Trial Court Information
385th District Court
Midland
Honorable Rodney Satterwhite, Judge
CV55324
Ann M. Record, Court Reporter