Case: 23-0564
23-0564
07/20/2023
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
ROXO ENERGY COMPANY, LLC; ROXO ENERGY, LLC; REC MINERALS, LLC; ROXO FW, LLC; AND VORTUS INVESTMENT ADVISORS, LLC
BAXSTO, LLC
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/21/2024 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | Amicus Curiae Brief received on behalf of Texas Oil & Gas Association submitted by Melissa Davis Andrews and Jared C. Lampson of Holland & Knight LLP of Austin, Texas. |
| ||||
02/01/2024 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Baxsto, LLC. | |||||
10/23/2023 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of ROXO Energy Company, LLC, et al. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/21/2024 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae Brief received on behalf of Texas Oil & Gas Association submitted by Melissa Davis Andrews and Jared C. Lampson of Holland & Knight LLP of Austin, Texas. |
| |||||
02/13/2024 | MET to file reply disposed of | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply in Support of Petition for Review is granted. Reply is due March 18, 2024. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. |
| ||||
02/13/2024 | Motion to Extend Time to File Reply filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Reply in Support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of ROXO Energy Company, LLC, et al. | ||||||
02/13/2024 | Notice from Counsel of a change in address | Notice of Change of Firm Name filed on behalf of Counsel for ROXO Energy Company, LLC, et al. | ||||||
02/01/2024 | Response to Petition | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Baxsto, LLC. | ||||||
12/22/2023 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review is granted. Response is due February 1, 2024. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. |
| ||||
12/22/2023 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Baxsto, LLC. | ||||||
12/01/2023 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to petition for review due no later than January 2, 2024. |
| |||||
10/31/2023 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
10/30/2023 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of Baxsto, LLC. | ||||||
10/23/2023 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of ROXO Energy Company, LLC, et al. |
| |||||
09/12/2023 | Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Third Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. Petition for Review is due October 23, 2023. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED. |
| ||||
09/11/2023 | Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed Third Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of ROXO Energy Company, LLC, et al. |
| |||||
08/17/2023 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. Petition for Review is due September 22, 2023. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. |
| ||||
08/17/2023 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of ROXO Energy Company, LLC, et al. |
| |||||
07/20/2023 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. Petition for Review is due August 23, 2023. |
| ||||
07/20/2023 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of ROXO Energy Company, LLC, et al. |
| |||||
07/20/2023 | Clerk's Record | | | |||||
07/20/2023 | Supplement to Clerk's/Reporter's Record | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/18/2024 | Status | Reply to Response due | FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. |
10/31/2023 | Work-Up by Staff / Review by Justices | Under Review |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
ROXO Energy, LLC | Petitioner | Mr. Connor R. Bourland Mr. Conrad D. Hester Mr. Scott A. Brister Mr. Ryan Clinton Mr. Robert Green Hargrove Mr. Robert C. Vartabedian |
ROXO FW, LLC | Petitioner | Mr. Robert Green Hargrove Mr. Ryan Clinton Mr. Cameron L. Davis Reina Cisneros Mr. Connor R. Bourland Mr. Robert C. Vartabedian Mr. Scott A. Brister |
Baxsto, LLC | Respondent | Mr. Alan S. Loewinsohn Mr. Robert B. Dubose Kerry F. Schonwald |
REC Minerals, LLC | Petitioner | Mr. Ryan Clinton Mr. Robert Green Hargrove Mr. Robert C. Vartabedian Reina Cisneros Mr. Connor R. Bourland Mr. Scott A. Brister Mr. Cameron L. Davis |
Texas Oil & Gas Association | Amicus Curiae | Jared C. Lampson Ms. Melissa Davis Andrews |
ROXO Energy Company, LLC | Petitioner | Mr. Scott A. Brister Mr. Robert Green Hargrove Mr. Conrad D. Hester Mr. Ryan Clinton Mr. Robert C. Vartabedian Mr. Cameron L. Davis Mr. Connor R. Bourland Reina Cisneros |
Vortus Investment Advisors, LLC | Petitioner | Mr. Robert C. Vartabedian Mr. Ryan Clinton Mr. Scott A. Brister Mr. Connor R. Bourland Mr. Cameron L. Davis Reina Cisneros Mr. Robert Green Hargrove |
Court of Appeals Information:
11-21-00183-CV
Reverse & Remand
___ SW3d ___, 04-20-23
11th Court of Appeals
Honorable William Stacy Trotter
Trial Court Information
118th District Court
Howard
Honorable Timothy D. Yeats
53632