judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3498
B-3498
07/21/1972
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF CORPUS CHRISTI, TEXAS WATER RIGHTS COMMISSION
NUECES COUNTY WATER CONTROL AND IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/15/1972Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/07/1972Response to PetitionRespondent
07/21/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
07/21/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/29/1973Response to Motion filed
11/16/1972Response to Motion filed
11/15/1972Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/07/1972Response to Petition
07/21/1972Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/21/1972Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/21/1972Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Nueces County Water Control and Improvement DistrictRespondent
Texas Water Rights CommissionPetitioner
City of Corpus ChristiPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information