Case: 02-23-00120-CV
02-23-00120-CV
04/17/2023
Mandamus
In re Contract Datascan Holdings, Inc., Contract Datascan, LP d/b/a The Inventory Extras, and Gwyn Nicole Snead
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/17/2023 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/02/2023 | Motion filed | Motion or Writ No Action Taken |
| ||||
05/02/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
05/02/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||
05/01/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||
04/28/2023 | Record filed |
| |||||
04/28/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||
04/24/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
04/20/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
04/18/2023 | Motion for emergency relief disposed | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||
04/18/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||
04/17/2023 | Submitted | | |||||
04/17/2023 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
| |||||
04/17/2023 | Motion for emergency relief filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/18/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Contract Datascan, LP | Relator | |
Contract Datascan Holdings, Inc. | Relator | Joel S. Allen |
Fahey, Megan | Respondent | Hon. Megan Fahey |
Retail Services WIS Corporaton | Real party in interest | John H. Cayce Michael D. Anderson Natalie L. Arbaugh |
Snead, Gwyn Nicole | Relator | Megan A. Altobelli Joel S. Allen Joel B. Bailey |
Trial Court Information
348th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Megan Fahey
348-341198-23