judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Shana Elliott and Lawrence Kalke v. City of College Station, Texas, Karl Mooney, Mayor of the City of College Station, and Bryan Woods, City Manager of the City of College Station

Case: 10-22-00320-CV
10-22-00320-CV
09/28/2022
Plea to jurisdiction
Shana Elliott and Lawrence Kalke
City of College Station, Texas, Karl Mooney, Mayor of the City of College Station, and Bryan Woods, City Manager of the City of College Station
No
6th Court of Appeals
10/20/2022
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
10/20/2022Case stored
10/20/2022Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGrant motion
10/05/2022Docketing statement filed
10/04/2022Clerks record filed
10/03/2022Fee paid
09/28/2022Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
09/16/2022Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/20/2022Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bryan Woods, City Manager of the City of College StationAppelleeAllison S. Killian
Adam C. Falco
John J. Hightower
Karl Mooney, Mayor of the City of College StationAppelleeAllison S. Killian
John J. Hightower
Adam C. Falco
City of College Station, TexasAppelleeAllison S. Killian
John J. Hightower
Adam C. Falco
Elliott, ShanaAppellantChristian Townsend
Robert Earl Henneke
Chance Weldon
Kalke, LawrenceAppellantChance Weldon
Robert Earl Henneke
Christian Townsend
Trial Court Information
85th District Court
Brazos
Honorable Hon. Kyle Hawthorne
22-001122-CV-85
Paula K. Frederick