judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ERIC D. WATSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1133
Short Caption:ERIC D. WATSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD7560-10Filed Date:09/09/2010

Opening Event Date:09/09/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/12/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/16/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantEric D. Watson YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/09/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that David Reiter, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
09/15/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) David Reiter, Esquire
10/07/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
10/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (118pgs/Tape) 8/11/10 proc. w/CD included (incomplete)dfe
10/22/2010RECORD INDEX
10/22/2010RECORD COPIES
10/26/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/02/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/02/2010APPENDIX
12/22/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days (no oppo). (after the completion of the transcript)dfe
01/10/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, wherein appellee indicate(s) that transcript is being prepared, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 40 days from the date the transcript is filed with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee shall advise this court within 15 days thereof of receipt of the ordered transcript. (By: JAC)
01/12/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (19pgs/Tape) 8/11/10 proc. (Inserts)
01/25/2011NOTICE RECEIVED - from aple re: receipt of transcripts
02/02/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 10, 2011, wherein appellee was directed to file the brief within 40 days from the date the transcript is filed with this court, and it appearing that the transcript has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee shall file the brief within 40 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
03/02/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
03/03/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - motion to file (LODGED) oppo - appellant's brief/appdx
03/21/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITIONto Motion for Summary Affirmance
03/21/2011RECEIVED - Opposition to Motion for Summary Affirmance (Titled as: Motion to Oppose Summary Affirmance)
04/22/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION TO FILE the lodged opposition IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the opposition. It is *****MORE*****
04/22/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION
04/22/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED. See Oliver T. Carr Mgmt Inc. v. Nat'l Deli, Inc. 397 A.2d 914, 915 (DC 1979)...SEE HARDCOPY It is *****MORE*****
04/22/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment ona ppeal be and hereby IS AFFIRMED. (BROBST)
04/28/2011CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER
05/16/2011MANDATE ISSUED