judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARGARET LUCILLE LARGENT, n/k/a MARGARET L. WOLFE v. JOHN D. LARGENT

Case Heading (S-07-0259)
Case Number:S-07-0259Case Docketed On:11/06/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:MARGARET LUCILLE LARGENT, n/k/a MARGARET L. WOLFE v. JOHN D. LARGENT
Full Title:MARGARET LUCILLE LARGENT, n/k/a MARGARET L. WOLFE, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. JOHN D. LARGENT, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMargaret L. WolfeLarry W. Harrington
AppelleeJohn D. LargentWilliam D. Hjelmstad

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Support, Marriage and Divorce, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 106
Citation:192 P.3d 130

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/06/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/06/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/06/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/26/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
02/07/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/12/2008Motion - Other - to allow designation of part of CV-79055-A for record transmissionMotionOtherFinal
02/14/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/25/2008Response/Objection - Motion to allow appellee's designation of part of CV-79055A for record for transmission to appellate courtResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
02/25/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/25/2008Event - Phone Call to counsel for appellant; inadvertenly sent objection without original copy of response - will sendEventPhone CallFinal
02/26/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/26/2008Order - Granting motion to allow appellee to designate part of record, from compansion case, for transmission to appellate court.OrderGrantFinal
02/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/28/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/28/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, exhibits; Volume IV, District Court Case CV-79055.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/28/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/08/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/24/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/24/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/26/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 9/25/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal