judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3534
B-3534
08/17/1972
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS AND WALTER C. ATCHLEY, WALTER C. ATCHLEY, STATE OF TEXAS
SUPERIOR OIL COMPANY, ET AL., MARATHON OIL COMPANY, MARATHON OIL COMPANY, ET AL., AND CHASE MANHATTAN BANK, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/17/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/22/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/29/1973Reply to ResponsePetitioner
10/06/1972Response to Reply filedPetitioner
10/03/1972Response to Reply filedPetitioner
09/29/1972Response to PetitionRespondent
09/08/1972Letter brief Petitioner
09/06/1972Appendix FiledPetitioner
09/01/1972Supplement to ResponseRespondent
09/01/1972Response to PetitionRespondent
08/17/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/26/1973Response to Motion filed
04/25/1973Response to Motion filed
04/17/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/22/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/29/1973Reply to Response
10/12/1972Response to Motion filed
10/06/1972Response to Reply filed
10/06/1972Motion to Certify filedOverruled
10/03/1972Response to Reply filed
09/29/1972Response to Motion filed
09/29/1972Response to Petition
09/22/1972Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
09/08/1972Letter brief
09/06/1972Appendix Filed
09/01/1972Supplement to Response
09/01/1972Response to Petition
08/17/1972Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/17/1972Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Superior Oil Company, et al.Respondent
State of Texas and Walter C. AtchleyPetitioner
Walter C. AtchleyPetitioner
Marathon Oil Company, et al., and Chase Manhattan Bank, et al.Respondent
MARATHON OIL COMPANYRespondent
State of TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information