judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Jesus J. Ortega a/k/a J. Jesus Ortega v. The State of Texas

Case: 13-23-00327-CR
13-23-00327-CR
08/01/2023
Continuous Sexual Abuse of Young Child or Children
Jesus J. Ortega a/k/a J. Jesus Ortega
The State of Texas
No
4th Court of Appeals
08/01/2023
04-23-00643-CR
13th Court of Appeals - Corpus Christi
08/01/2023
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
02/20/2024Brief filed - oral argument not requestedPro Se
12/08/2023Brief received - oral argument not requestedAnders
12/08/2023Anders brief filedAppellant
11/13/2023Brief received - oral argument not requestedAnders
10/27/2023Brief received - oral argument not requestedAnders
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
02/21/2024Set for submission on briefs
02/20/2024Brief filed - oral argument not requested
01/29/2024Supplemental clerks record filed
01/25/2024Document Received
01/23/2024Telephone inquiry to or from the court
01/08/2024Letter received
01/08/2024Supplemental clerks record filed
12/20/2023Motion for extension disposedGrant motion
12/20/2023Motion disposedGrant motion
12/20/2023Order entered
12/15/2023Motion for extension of time to file response disposedGrant motion
12/15/2023Motion to withdraw attorney disposedCarried with the case
12/13/2023Motion for extension filed
12/13/2023Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/08/2023Anders brief filed
12/08/2023Case ready to be set
12/08/2023Motion for leave filed
12/08/2023Brief received - oral argument not requested
12/04/2023Motion filed
12/01/2023Motion for extension of time to file response disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/30/2023Letter issued by the court
11/27/2023Motion filed
11/27/2023Motion to appoint attorney filed
11/27/2023Motion for extension of time to file response filed
11/20/2023Letter filed
11/17/2023Motion for extension of time to file response filed
11/13/2023Motion to withdraw attorney filed
11/13/2023Brief received - oral argument not requested
11/13/2023Letter issued by the court
10/27/2023Brief received - oral argument not requested
10/05/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
10/04/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/29/2023Notice of late brief
08/28/2023Clerks record filed
08/28/2023Corrected document requested
08/28/2023Corrected document requested
08/24/2023Exhibits filed
08/24/2023Reporters record filed
08/23/2023Extension of time to file clerks record disposedGrant motion
08/23/2023Extension of time to file clerks record filed
08/23/2023No clerks record filed in criminal case
08/22/2023Telephone inquiry to or from the court
08/22/2023Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGrant motion
08/22/2023Extension of time to file reporters record filed
08/21/2023Corrected document requested
08/08/2023Trial court certification filed
08/08/2023Notice to trial court that certification is missing
08/03/2023Document filed
08/01/2023Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
07/31/2023Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGrant motion
07/24/2023Letter filed
07/20/2023Docketing statement filed
06/30/2023Case began in court of appeals
06/30/2023Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
06/21/2023Sentence imposed in the trial court
06/21/2023Notice of appeal filed in trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/11/2024StatusState brief due
03/13/2024SubmissionBriefs
11/30/2023MotionMotion to withdraw as attorney
12/07/2023MotionMiscellaneous motion
12/07/2023MotionMiscellaneous motion
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ortega, Jesus J.Criminal - AppellantHon. Richard L. Ellison
Mr. Jesus J. Ortega
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasHon. Lucy Wilke
Trial Court Information
216th District Court
Gillespie
Honorable Albert D. Pattillo
DC6137
Dandy Middleton
99 yrs TDCJ-ID; Reimbursement $330