Case: 07-23-00010-CR
07-23-00010-CR
01/13/2023
Murder
Christopher Michael Yager
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/08/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State |
| ||||
05/31/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/28/2023 | Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk | | |||||||
12/27/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
10/03/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
10/02/2023 | Submitted | | |||||||
09/11/2023 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||||
09/08/2023 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
09/08/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
08/09/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
07/28/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file supplemental brief disposed | Motion Granted |
| ||||||
07/27/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file supplemental brief filed |
| |||||||
07/13/2023 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | Motion Granted |
| ||||||
07/11/2023 | Record Sent | | |||||||
07/10/2023 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed |
| |||||||
07/10/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file supplemental brief disposed | Motion Granted |
| ||||||
07/10/2023 | Motion to abate appeal disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||||||
07/06/2023 | Record Sent | | |||||||
07/03/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file supplemental brief filed |
| |||||||
06/22/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
06/05/2023 | Motion to abate appeal filed |
| |||||||
05/31/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
05/24/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion Granted |
| ||||||
05/24/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
04/20/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion Granted |
| ||||||
04/20/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
03/28/2023 | Exhibits filed | | |||||||
03/28/2023 | Motion to access appellate record disp | Motion Granted | | ||||||
03/27/2023 | Motion to access appellate record filed |
| |||||||
03/21/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
03/13/2023 | Sealed clerk record filed | | |||||||
03/13/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
01/26/2023 | Document filed | | |||||||
01/17/2023 | Docketing statement requested | | |||||||
01/13/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
01/13/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||||
01/12/2023 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/27/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | John L. Owen |
Yager, Christopher Michael | Criminal - Appellant |
Trial Court Information
108th District Court
Potter
Honorable Douglas R. Woodburn
079319-E-CR
Jana Smith