Case: 11-22-00365-CV
11-22-00365-CV
12/30/2022
Permissive Appeal and or Petition for Permissive Appeal
Boren Descendants and Royalty Owners
Fasken Oil and Ranch, Ltd.; Fasken Land and Minerals, Ltd.; and Fasken Royalty Investments, Ltd.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/16/2023 | Additional authorities filed | Appellee |
| ||||||
09/11/2023 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||||
07/21/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee |
| ||||||
05/18/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
| ||||||
12/30/2022 | Petition for Permissive Appeal filed | Petitioner |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/06/2023 | Submitted | | |||||||
12/04/2023 | Oral argument exhibits filed |
| |||||||
12/04/2023 | Oral argument exhibits filed |
| |||||||
11/16/2023 | Additional authorities filed |
| |||||||
11/02/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
10/11/2023 | Set for submission on oral argument |
| |||||||
09/11/2023 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||||
08/10/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
08/02/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed |
| |||||||
07/21/2023 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
07/21/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||
07/13/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
07/05/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
06/15/2023 | Motion to reconsider disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
06/12/2023 | Motion to reconsider filed |
| |||||||
06/08/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
06/02/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
05/18/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||
05/03/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
05/01/2023 | Telephone call received | | |||||||
04/25/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
03/30/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
03/23/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
03/14/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
03/06/2023 | Extension of time to file clerks record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
03/06/2023 | Extension of time to file clerks record filed | | |||||||
03/06/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||||
02/23/2023 | Order entered |
| |||||||
02/02/2023 | Reply to response or motion filed |
| |||||||
01/31/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||||
01/26/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||||
01/19/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file response disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
01/12/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file response filed |
| |||||||
01/06/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
01/05/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file response disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
01/05/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file response filed |
| |||||||
12/30/2022 | Response requested by the court |
| |||||||
12/30/2022 | Petition for Permissive Appeal filed |
| |||||||
12/30/2022 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||||
12/20/2022 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/06/2023 | Submitted | Submitted on oral argument |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Fasken Land and Minerals, Ltd. | Appellee | Anna M. Baker Harriet O'Neill Nicholas Bacarisse Pamela M. Dupuis Everard A. Marseglia Jr. Nancy H. Elliott Douglas W. Alexander Thomas A. Zabel |
Royalty Owners | Appellant | Joshua S. Smith Mary Kate Raffetto David M. Gunn Matthew P. Whitley |
Boren Descendants | Appellant | David M. Gunn Mary Kate Raffetto Thomas A. Zabel Joshua S. Smith Everard A. Marseglia Jr. Matthew P. Whitley Pamela M. Dupuis |
The Mabee Ranch Royalty Partnership, L.P. | Unknown | Jill C. Pennington Peter E. Hosey Jasdeep Brar Robert M. Biedrzycki Reagan M. Marble |
315 MR, Inc. | Unknown | Peter E. Hosey Reagan M. Marble Jill C. Pennington Jasdeep Brar Robert M. Biedrzycki |
93 JM, Inc. | Unknown | Peter E. Hosey Jasdeep Brar Reagan M. Marble Jill C. Pennington Robert M. Biedrzycki |
Fasken Royalty Investments, Ltd. | Appellee | Nancy H. Elliott Everard A. Marseglia Jr. Anna M. Baker Douglas W. Alexander Harriet O'Neill Nicholas Bacarisse Thomas A. Zabel Pamela M. Dupuis |
Fasken Oil and Ranch, Ltd. | Appellee | Harriet O'Neill Thomas A. Zabel Nancy H. Elliott Douglas W. Alexander Nicholas Bacarisse Pamela M. Dupuis Anna M. Baker Everard A. Marseglia Jr. |
Trial Court Information
118th District Court
Martin
Honorable Timothy D. Yeats, Judge
7481
Karen E. Freeman, Court Reporter, Howard County