Case: 24-0105
24-0105
02/09/2024
Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review pursuant to Tex. R. App. P. 53.7(f)
WATERSTONE ON LAKE CONROE, INC. AND STEVE BOWEN
KEITH DEWBERRY AND JOHN T. FONT
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/01/2024 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted. Petition for Review is due March 29, 2024. FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. |
| ||||
03/01/2024 | Response to Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review | Response to Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Kevin Dewberry, et al. | ||||||
02/29/2024 | Electronic communication received from Party | Respondent is opposed to second motion for extension of time to file petition for review and will file a response no later than March 1, 2024. | | |||||
02/29/2024 | Electronic communication sent to Party | Email sent to respondent to determine if they are opposed or unopposed to the second motion for extension of time to file petition for review. | | |||||
02/28/2024 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Second Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review file don behalf of Waterstone on Lake Conroe, Inc., et al. |
| |||||
02/09/2024 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review is granted in part. Petition for Review is due February 28, 2024. |
| ||||
02/09/2024 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Waterstone on Lake Conroe, Inc., et al. |
| |||||
02/09/2024 | Court reporter/recorder's record | | | |||||
02/09/2024 | Clerk's Record | | | |||||
02/09/2024 | Court reporter/recorder's record | | | |||||
02/09/2024 | Court reporter/recorder's record | | | |||||
02/09/2024 | Clerk's Record | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/29/2024 | Status | Petition for review due to be filed at Supreme Court | FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSIONS OF TIME FOR THIS FILING WILL BE DISFAVORED. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Dewberry, Keith | Respondent | Mr. Brett J. Sileo Mr. Britton B. Harris |
Cunningham, Kim | Other interested party | Mr. Britton B. Harris Mr. Brett J. Sileo |
Bowen, Steve | Petitioner | Ms. Megan B. Rapp Ms. Kenna Mercer Seiler |
Kozak, Thomas | Other interested party | Mr. Brett J. Sileo Mr. Britton B. Harris |
Waterstone on Lake Conroe, Inc. | Petitioner | Ms. Megan B. Rapp Ms. Kenna Mercer Seiler |
Font, John T. | Respondent | Mr. Brett J. Sileo Mr. Britton B. Harris |
Kozak, Elizabeth | Other interested party | Mr. Britton B. Harris Mr. Brett J. Sileo |
Court of Appeals Information:
09-22-00020-CV
Affirmed
___ SW3d ___, 12-14-23
9th Court of Appeals
Honorable W. Scott Golemon
Trial Court Information
457th District Court
Montgomery
Honorable Vincenzo Santini
18-03-03990-CV