Case: 01-23-00306-CV
01-23-00306-CV
04/21/2023
Contract
McDaniel Homes, LLC and Gerald Ryan McDaniel
Thomas and Kristy Moore
No
www.txcourts.gov/1stcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/06/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
07/25/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismiss appeal |
| ||||||
07/25/2023 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
07/25/2023 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||||
07/24/2023 | Submitted | | |||||||
07/24/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||||
06/26/2023 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||||
06/26/2023 | Response due | | |||||||
06/23/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Grant motion to extend time; absent extraordinary circumstances, Court will not grant additional motions to extend time |
| ||||||
06/23/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||||
06/22/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||||
06/12/2023 | Response due | | |||||||
06/07/2023 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||||
05/30/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||||
05/25/2023 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||||
05/23/2023 | Clerks notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||||
05/23/2023 | Record due | | |||||||
05/17/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
05/17/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||||||
05/17/2023 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record | Refused |
| ||||||
05/12/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
05/12/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||||
05/12/2023 | Past due court fee notice |
| |||||||
05/11/2023 | Court fee due | | |||||||
05/11/2023 | Docketing statement due | | |||||||
04/24/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
04/24/2023 | Notice of appeal received |
| |||||||
04/21/2023 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||||
04/21/2023 | Notice of appeal received |
| |||||||
04/20/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
02/21/2023 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||||
01/23/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/06/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
10/06/2029 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Thomas and Kristy Moore | Appellee | Philip J. McCrady-Nolen Kyle L. Dickson |
McDaniel Homes, LLC and Gerald Ryan McDaniel | Appellant | Paul Kirklin |
Trial Court Information
122nd District Court
Galveston
Honorable Judge 122nd District Court
20-CV-0766
Connie Chan