judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3523
B-3523
08/09/1972
Direct Appeal
DOUGLAS ALBERT BOYD
LEWIS RADFORD BOYD, SR., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/09/1972Direct Appeal filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/11/1972Petition for ___ filedOverruled
10/07/1972Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
09/25/1972Motion to lift stay filedOverruled
08/28/1972Letter Filed
08/09/1972Direct Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lewis Radford Boyd, Sr., et al.Appellee
Douglas Albert BoydAppellant
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information