Case: 03-22-00609-CR
03-22-00609-CR
09/28/2022
Aggravated Assault
Timothy Scott Richardson
The State of Texas
No
8th Court of Appeals
10/27/2022
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/27/2022 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals |
| |||
10/21/2022 | Clerks record filed | | |||
10/21/2022 | Clerks record filed |
| |||
10/01/2022 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
09/28/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/27/2022 | Case Stored | Case stored |
10/27/2047 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Mr. Justin Bradford Smith The Honorable Stacey M. Soule |
Richardson, Timothy Scott | Criminal - Appellant | Mr. John A. Kuchera |
Trial Court Information
264th District Court
Bell
Honorable Paul L. LePak
80983
Elizabeth A. Young
Nine years