Case: 08-23-00345-CV
08-23-00345-CV
12/01/2023
Miscellaneous/other civil
Double H. Contracting, Inc. and Hector Hinojos, Sr.
El Paso Water Utilities Public Service Board, as Agent for The City of El Paso, The City of El Paso, Ztex Construction, Inc., and Tao Industries, Inc. d/b/a Hawk Construction
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/04/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/04/2024 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
02/27/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
02/27/2024 | Fee paid | | |||||
02/27/2024 | Order entered |
| |||||
02/26/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
01/29/2024 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
01/18/2024 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
12/28/2023 | Order entered |
| |||||
12/28/2023 | Case reinstated | | |||||
12/22/2023 | Objection filed |
| |||||
12/21/2023 | Letter received | | |||||
12/21/2023 | Letter received | | |||||
12/11/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
12/08/2023 | Order issued | Abated |
| ||||
12/08/2023 | Submitted | | |||||
12/08/2023 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
12/08/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
12/05/2023 | Fee paid | | |||||
12/01/2023 | Court fee due |
| |||||
12/01/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/03/2024 | Status | Appellee brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Ztex Construction, Inc. and Tao Industries, Inc. d/b/a Hawk Construction | Appellee | Hon. James A. Martinez |
El Paso Water Utilities Public Service Board, as Agent for The City of El Paso and The City of El Paso | Appellee | Steven H. Weller |
Double H. Contracting, Inc. and Hector Hinojos, Sr. | Appellant | Hon. Savannah Stroud Hon. Paul H. Sanderford |
Trial Court Information
384th District Court
El Paso
Honorable The Honorable Patrick Garcia
2023-DCV-1654
Kathy Supnet