Case: 01-23-00134-CR
01-23-00134-CR
02/24/2023
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Ariel Cordoba
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/31/2023 | Anders brief filed | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/15/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
09/15/2023 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||
09/15/2023 | Motion for rehearing enbanc due | | |||||
09/15/2023 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
08/31/2023 | Anders brief filed |
| |||||
08/31/2023 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed |
| |||||
08/31/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismiss appeal |
| ||||
08/31/2023 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||
08/31/2023 | Motion to access appellate record disp | Denied as moot | | ||||
08/30/2023 | Submitted | | |||||
07/03/2023 | Motion to access appellate record filed |
| |||||
06/08/2023 | Supplemental clerks record filed |
| |||||
06/06/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
06/05/2023 | Response due | | |||||
05/24/2023 | Notice of late brief |
| |||||
05/12/2023 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
05/08/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||
04/12/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
04/07/2023 | Order entered | Issue sua sponte order |
| ||||
04/03/2023 | Reporters record due | | |||||
03/02/2023 | No reporters record filed in criminal case |
| |||||
02/28/2023 | Pro Se indigent appellant or inmate sent a copy of record | | |||||
02/28/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
02/27/2023 | Record due | | |||||
02/24/2023 | Notice of appeal received |
| |||||
02/24/2023 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
01/12/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
12/28/2022 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/15/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
11/15/2048 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | The Honorable Kim K Ogg Jessica A. Caird |
Cordoba, Ariel | Criminal - Appellant | Andrew Johnston Williams |
Trial Court Information
339th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge 339th District Court
1711923
Court Reporter 339th District Court
20 YEARS TDC