judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BARROTT (PEGGY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33417
Short Caption:BARROTT (PEGGY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR972870Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/03/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/03/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 98-00235
12/30/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 98-00561
12/30/1998AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 98-00562
01/19/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. Mailed on: 1/15/99. 99-00353
02/16/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Rough draft transcripts from court reporter R. Walker due: 10 days from the date of this order, or show cause why he/she should not be sanctioned. 99-01032
02/25/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. 10/29/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Randi Lee Walker. 99-01282
04/16/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-02986
05/12/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-03840
05/12/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/25/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 18, 1999. 99-03840