judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PETER B. STEIGER and SYLVIA STEIGER v. HAPPY VALLEY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Case Heading (S-07-0260)
Case Number:S-07-0260Case Docketed On:11/08/2007
Linked To: S-09-0081
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Corporations, Partnerships and Associations (Title 17)
Short Title:PETER B. STEIGER and SYLVIA STEIGER v. HAPPY VALLEY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Full Title:PETER B. STEIGER and SYLVIA STEIGER, Appellants (Defendants), v. HAPPY VALLEY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPeter B. Steiger Pro Se
AppellantSylvia Steiger Pro Se
AppelleeHappy Valley Homeowners AssociationWilliam D. Bagley

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Appellate Procedure, Civil Procedure, Property -Servitudes
Opinion Number:2010 WY 158
Citation:245 P.3d 269 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/08/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/08/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/08/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/05/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantsMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/18/2007Order - Dismiss - partial and stay of briefingOrderDismiss - partialFinal
01/30/2008System - Status check - other - contacted district court regarding status of entry of judgment. She indicated that the last thing on the docket was a request for setting to hear testimony on a counterclaim. No setting has yet been scheduled.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
03/06/2008System - Status check - other. Contacted district court - still no action, last thing in file is request for setting but none set. Diane contacted Judge's office and his JA said that the judge is reviewing the file. Said I'll check back in 2 weeks.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
03/26/2008System - Status check - other. Spoke with Diane, she stated that file was still down in Judge Arnold's Chambers with no action taken. She will let his judicial assistant know that we are calling about it. Set tickler to check again in a few weeks.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
04/11/2008System - Status check - other - Spoke with Diane, she stated she got the same response as in previous inquiries: file was still down in Judge Arnold's Chambers with no action taken. Judicial Assistant will let the Judge know that we are calling about it. Set tickler to check again in a few weeks.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
06/27/2008System - Status check - other - contacted Judge Arnold re status of pending matters there. He indicated that he has made a decision, but is still putting it together. He will try to finish it the week of July 14, 2008.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
08/04/2008System - Status check - other - contacted Judge Arnold regarding the decision in this matter, has not written final order.SystemStatus check - remandFinal
08/28/2008System - Status check - other - contacted clerk of district court regarding status - no order has been entered. Contacted Judge Arnold's chamber. Kelly called back and said she will bring it to his attention again. Requested a call back with possible timeframe for order.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
09/04/2008System - Status check - other - received email from Judge Arnold in response to question on status - he hopes to get to it soon.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
09/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Notice of filing of Judgment - Judge Arnold sent email indicating that a judgment has been entered.Notice-IncomingNotice of filing of JudgmentFinal
10/13/2008Event - Phone Call. Called district court and requested copy of Judgment. Received faxed copy of judgment filed 9/24/08. Will wait 30 days for notice of appeal to be filed and then refer to staff attorney.EventPhone CallFinal
10/29/2008Event - Phone Call to district court re second notice of appeal. Appellants have filed a motion to alter or amend judgmentEventPhone CallFinal
12/05/2008System - Status check - other - contacted Judge Arnold's office. No order has been entered yet. Assistant will check on it.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
12/31/2008System - Status check - called Judge's chambers and left message 12/29/08. Called again, JA indicated that she gave Judge the message and he will be callingSystemStatus check - otherFinal
01/14/2009System - Status check - other - contacted clerk of district court. No order has been entered yet.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
01/21/2009System - Status check - other. Contacted clerk of district court. No order on motion to alter or amend judgment has been entered, but an order allowing the Steigers to proceed in forma pauperis has been. Spoke to Judge Arnold and asked if motion to alter or amend is now considered deemed denied. He stated that he intends to enter an order and hopes to have it finished in a week.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
01/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Status report - other - received notification from Judge Arnold that no order to proceed in forma pauperis was filed and he has denied that motion; and that an order has been signed denying appellants' post trial motion even though it was deemed denied by operation of the rule.Notice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
04/16/2009Event - Phone Call -District Court Clerk re record. Told her to continue numbering on this index.EventPhone CallFinal
04/22/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter. Brief schedule in S-07-0260 resumed by notice in this letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/18/2009Motion - Extension of time - brief of AppellantsMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/19/2009Order - Grant - extension of time (Sixty day extension requested, forty-five day extension granted)OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/02/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/06/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/10/2009Motion - Brief - exceed page limit (and third extension of time)MotionBrief - exceed page limitFinal
08/12/2009Order - Grant - third extension of time. Order granting appellants' request for extension to file brief and order denying appellants' motion for permission for additional pages in brief (no further extensions will be considered).OrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
08/12/2009Response/Objection - Motion. Objection to appellants' motion for permission for additional pages in brief. (No action taken, court has already entered order denying request for additional pages earlier today.)Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
08/20/2009Brief - Appellants and copy of brief on cdBriefAppellantFinal
08/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
08/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Objection to Appellants' Motion for Permission for Additional Pages in Brief (Untimely--received 9 days late)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/04/2009Notice-Incoming - Request to place on expedited docket by AppellantsNotice-IncomingRequest to place on brief only docketFinal
10/05/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/07/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/19/2009Brief - Appellants reply briefBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/19/2009Motion - Stay - other - Appellants' motion to stay judgment on appeal; and received proposed order.MotionStay - otherFinal
10/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/26/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/05/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Exhibits; Volume V, Original Supreme Court Record 05-110.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/10/2009Order - Denying Motion for StayOrderDenyFinal
12/01/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
04/02/2010Notice-Incoming - Change of address from AppellantsNotice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
06/29/2010Record - Supplemental record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, transcripts (labeled as Volume VI).RecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
06/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Supplemental record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingSupplemental record on appeal filedFinal
12/07/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the court. Justice Voigt files a specially concurring opinion. Justice Hill files a dissenting opinion, in which Justice Golden joins.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/23/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/23/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/28/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/27/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal