judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GARY A. FREEMAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1134
Short Caption:GARY A. FREEMAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL12926-91Filed Date:09/02/2010

Opening Event Date:09/02/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/30/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/24/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/01/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/09/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGary A. Freeman YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Travis A. Hill YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/02/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Randy McDonald, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
09/15/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Randy McDonald, Esquire
10/15/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)(Appellant's). (rt ordered/needed)dfe
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (54pgs/Johnson) 4/6/10 proc.
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (149pgs/Johnson) 4/7/10 proc.
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (84pgs/Hawkins) 4/8/10 proc.
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (92pgs/Hill) 4/20/10 proc. w/CD
01/04/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (Superior Court Order filed 4/26/10) (2 copies) ****(SEALED)****
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX
01/05/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (95pgs/Johnson) 4/6/10 proc. afternoon w/CD
02/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 40 days after receipt of transcripts. no oppo
02/17/2011STATEMENT - transcripts have been received.
03/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo for 90 days
03/30/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/30/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7 (490 pages--Pirfo) (9/14,15,16/92 proc.) (Transferred from 93-CF-202)
03/30/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #8 (592 pages--Farmer) (9/8-11/92 proc.) (Transferred from 93-CF-202)
04/07/2011 On consideration of appellant's motions for extensions of time within which to file the brief, to which no oppositions have been filed, it is ORDERED that the motions are granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 27, 2011. (By: JAC)
06/27/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 7/25/11
07/13/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief
07/25/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/25/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/24/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/24/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/26/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - reply brief Reply Brief until October 26, 2011 (Appellant)Granted
10/12/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief
10/17/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
10/25/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/01/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Beckwith, Farrell
03/07/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
03/29/2012WithdrawnMandate**************RECALLED 5/18/12
05/01/2012FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant)Granted
05/01/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE
05/18/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Recall Mandate and APPELLANT SHALL FILE HIS PET FOR REHEARING/EN BANC W/N 14 DAYS
06/01/2012FiledMotion for extension of time to file petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc for 30 days (Appellant)
06/07/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension of time to file the petition to 7/2/12.
07/09/2012FiledORDERED that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith.
07/09/2012FiledMandate
08/03/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)