judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2819
A-2819
07/24/1950
Application for Writ of Error
LOUIS M. CAVANAUGH, ET AL.
ANNIE LAURIE BARROW DAVIS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/18/1951Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/02/1950Brief on the MeritsRespondent
09/05/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
07/24/1950Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/24/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/01/1951Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
01/18/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/03/1951Opinion issued
11/02/1950Brief on the Merits
10/04/1950Document received (See Remarks)
09/05/1950Response to Petition
07/24/1950Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/24/1950Motion for leave to file brief
07/24/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/24/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Louis M. Cavanaugh, et al.Petitioner
Cecil A. MorganAmicus Curiae
Carl Springer, Carlisle Cravens, Gillis A. JohnsonAmicus Curiae
Annie Laurie Barrow DavisRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information