judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

James Irven Staley III v. The State of Texas

Case: 02-23-00053-CR
02-23-00053-CR
03/22/2023
Capital Murder
James Irven Staley III
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
03/05/2024Reply brief filedState
02/15/2024Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
02/01/2024Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
11/02/2023Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
03/06/2024Additional copies of documents received after initial filing
03/05/2024Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/05/2024Reply brief filed
03/04/2024Motion for leave filed
02/28/2024Additional copies of documents received after initial filing
02/16/2024Set for submission on oral argument
02/15/2024Electronic reply brief filed
02/12/2024Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
02/01/2024Case ready to be set
02/01/2024Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/01/2024Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested
02/01/2024Motion filed
01/02/2024Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/27/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/30/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/29/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/02/2023Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested
10/25/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/23/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/17/2023Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed
10/16/2023Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed
09/28/2023Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
09/25/2023Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/25/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/22/2023Motion filed
09/22/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/23/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/22/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/04/2023Appearance of counsel
07/24/2023Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
07/24/2023Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
07/24/2023Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
07/24/2023Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
07/24/2023Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
07/24/2023Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
07/24/2023Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
07/24/2023Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
07/24/2023Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
07/24/2023Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
07/24/2023Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
07/24/2023Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
07/24/2023Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
07/24/2023Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
07/24/2023Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
07/12/2023Electronic Clerks Record Filed
07/11/2023Extension of time to file reporters record disposed
07/11/2023Extension of time to file reporters record filed
03/31/2023Docketing statement filed
03/28/2023Letter filed
03/22/2023Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/12/2024SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasBryce Perry
Staley, III, James IrvenCriminal - AppellantKeith S. Hampton
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Tarrant
Honorable Douglas A. Allen
1744358D
Court Reporter, 89th District Court
Life TDCJ