Case: 03-23-00436-CV
03-23-00436-CV
07/21/2023
Damages
Anthony Bowers
Katina Bowers and A'Nya Bowers
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/31/2024 | Brief was not filed | Appellee | | ||
10/10/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
| ||
10/06/2023 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/31/2024 | Case ready to be set | | |||
01/31/2024 | Brief was not filed | | |||
11/28/2023 | Notice of late brief |
| |||
10/10/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||
10/06/2023 | Brief received - oral argument not requested | | |||
09/11/2023 | Exhibits filed | | |||
09/11/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||
09/06/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||
09/05/2023 | Notice of late record |
| |||
09/01/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
08/23/2023 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||
08/22/2023 | Notice of late record |
| |||
08/09/2023 | Fee paid | | |||
08/07/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposed | Motion Granted in part |
| ||
07/24/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed | | |||
07/21/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/31/2024 | At Issue | Ready for disposition on briefs |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Bowers, Katina | Appellee | Ms. Katina Bowers |
Bowers, A'Anya | Appellee | Ms. A'Anya Bowers |
Bowers, Anthony | Appellant | Mr. Bobby Dale Barina |
Trial Court Information
146th District Court
Bell
Honorable Jack Weldon Jones
22DCV330494
Jessica Jacobi