judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

M.J. DEAN CONSTRUCTION VS. FAVELA

Case Information: 36315
Short Caption:M.J. DEAN CONSTRUCTION VS. FAVELACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A412466Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/26/2000 / Paustian, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/20/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from J. Michael McGroarty, Chartered--check no. 17357.
06/20/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10521
06/26/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/02/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 00-13366
08/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to the motion for voluntary dismissal filed on August 2, 2000, " . . . this apeal is dismissed." NNP/CLK 00-14084
08/11/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.