judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTONIO M. SMITH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 08-CO-1671
Short Caption:ANTONIO M. SMITH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL1141-02Filed Date:06/30/2008

Opening Event Date:06/30/2008Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/08/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/22/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAntonio M. Smith YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/30/2008NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/30/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on une 30, 2008, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
10/08/2010RECORD INDEX
10/08/2010RECORD COPIES
10/08/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/15/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/30/2010ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
11/30/2010DISMISSED
12/22/2010MANDATE ISSUED