judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SALLY JO GRANZER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0010)
Case Number:S-08-0010Case Docketed On:01/18/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Morals, Decency and Family 6-4-101 - 6-4-502
Short Title:SALLY JO GRANZER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:SALLY JO GRANZER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSally Jo GranzerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 118
Citation:193 P.3d 266 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/18/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/18/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/18/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/06/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/06/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/17/2008Brief - Appellee (Notice: The file stamp on this e-filed document is incorrect due to a problem with a system update. It bears the Montana Supreme Court watermark. The original has been filed with the Clerk of the Wyoming Supreme Court)BriefAppelleeFinal
04/18/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/13/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volume I, original paper; Volume II, exhibits; Volume III, confidential folder; Volume IV, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/13/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/16/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/20/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David Westling for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/11/2008Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by Jenny L. Craig on behalf of appellee (Certificate of Service notes electronic filing--rejected)Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
06/19/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E Westling, Senior Assistant Public Defender for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/19/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/08/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/10/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
10/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/24/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/24/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/29/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/28/08 by Greta Evans.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
10/29/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Mandate signed for 10/27/08 for warden at Wyoming State Penitentiary.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal