judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MELVIN I. COVINGTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1183
Short Caption:MELVIN I. COVINGTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead: 10-CF-1130 Consolidated:10-CF-1183
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-16038-09Filed Date:09/17/2010

Opening Event Date:09/17/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/16/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/16/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/16/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMelvin I. Covington YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Sarah J. Schall YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/17/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/08/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Sarah Stockwell, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
10/08/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Sarah Stockwell, Esquire
12/01/2010 On consideration of this court's order of October 8, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
12/10/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT
12/10/2010RECEIVED- aplt's statment regarding transcripts
12/16/2010RECORD INDEX
12/16/2010RECORD COPIES
12/16/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/28/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (Castillo)
12/28/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
01/19/2011ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CF-1130 and 10-CF-1183 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that appellant Melvin I. Covington's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order. F/O that the brief and limited appendix of appellant Nathaniel O. Addison remain due on May 31, 2011. F/O that appellee's consolidated brief shall be filed 30 days after both appellants' brief and limited appendices are filed with this court. (JAC)
02/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 60 days. no oppo
02/25/2011 On consideration of appellant Melvin I. Covington's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that appellant Melvin I. Covington's motion is granted and appellant Melvin I. Covington's brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 31, 2011. (JAC)
05/18/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF (Addison)
05/18/2011APPENDIX
05/27/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF (COVINGTON) appendix attached
05/27/2011APPENDIX
07/01/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
07/01/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
07/05/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD no oppo w/cd's #17-21
07/12/2011FiledOn consideration of the unopposed motion of appellee to supplement the record with the lodged five CD's containing the audio-video recordings, that were part of the record in the trial court, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodge five CD's containing the audio-video recordings will be forwarded to the Appeals Coordinator's Office for trasnmittal to this court as a supplemental record. (pii)
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (5 cd's - audio/visual recordings)
07/25/2011FiledReply Brief (Covington) (Appellant)
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/16/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, Steadman
01/24/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
01/31/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
02/08/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Covington/Appellant)
02/16/2012FiledMandate